NJ S2846 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades certain crimes related to manufacturing firearms from third degree to second degree.
Title
Upgrades certain crimes related to manufacturing firearms from third degree to second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4367 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4367 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.53. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-14-0) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4367 |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-6) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4367 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S2846