NJ S2793 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers, SHBP and SEHBP to provide coverage for digital tomosynthesis for screening and diagnostic purposes related to breast cancer.
Title
Requires health insurers, SHBP and SEHBP to provide coverage for digital tomosynthesis for screening and diagnostic purposes related to breast cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4320 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4320 (1R) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4320 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2793 (1R)