NJ S2787 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.241.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.241.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes vocational training pilot program in DOC; provides for inmate compensation for education and workforce training participation.
Title
Establishes vocational training pilot program in DOC; provides for inmate compensation for education and workforce training participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4273 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4273 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4273 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4273 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.241. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-24-0) |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2015-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (34-2) |
2015-08-13 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (31-1) |
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-2) |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-25-1) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4273 (1R) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4273 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Substituted by S2787 (1R)