NJ S2759 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to maintain and pay premiums for student accident insurance.
Title
Requires school districts to maintain and pay premiums for student accident insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4358 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee