NJ S2736 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3333
Note: Carry Over of previous S2599
Note: Carry Over of previous S2599
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-10-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces references to "alien" and "illegal alien" in statutes with "noncitizen" and "undocumented noncitizen," respectively; prohibits use of those terms by executive branch agencies.
Title
Replaces references to "alien" and "illegal alien" in statutes with "noncitizen" and "undocumented noncitizen," respectively; prohibits use of those terms by executive branch agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-10-24 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1374 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3333 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2599 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A3333 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2599 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)