NJ S2715 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.47.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.47.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Attorney General to develop protocol for retaining footage from school surveillance system.
Title
Requires Attorney General to develop protocol for retaining footage from school surveillance system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4199 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.47. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A4199 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4199 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2715