NJ S2704 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $30 million to EDA from federal "Coronavirus Relief Fund" to assist food establishments impacted by Executive Order No. 158.
Title
Appropriates $30 million to EDA from federal "Coronavirus Relief Fund" to assist food establishments impacted by Executive Order No. 158.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4413 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A4413 |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4413 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2704