NJ A4413 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $30 million to EDA from federal "Coronavirus Relief Fund" to assist food establishments impacted by Executive Order No. 158.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $30 million to EDA from federal "Coronavirus Relief Fund" to assist food establishments impacted by Executive Order No. 158.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-27AssemblySubstituted by S2704
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-08-24AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-07-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2704 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback