NJ S2689 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises effective dates of various provisions of P.L.2017, c.331 concerning animal cruelty law enforcement.
Title
Revises effective dates of various provisions of P.L.2017, c.331 concerning animal cruelty law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4225 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4225 (Same As) 2018-07-26 - Approved P.L.2018, c.69.