NJ S2675 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A4284 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A4284 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that school districts and nonpublic schools may receive reimbursement for costs incurred on or after January 1, 2016 for testing school drinking water for lead.*
Title
Provides that school districts and nonpublic schools may receive reimbursement for costs incurred on or after January 1, 2016 for testing school drinking water for lead.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4284 (1R) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4284 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.86.