NJ S2602 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A4111 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A4111 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows wagering at casinos and racetracks on certain professional and collegiate sports or athletic events.
Title
Allows wagering at casinos and racetracks on certain professional and collegiate sports or athletic events.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Substituted by A4111 (2R) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Van Drew) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4111 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Approved P.L.2018, c.33.