NJ S2602 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A4111 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows wagering at casinos and racetracks on certain professional and collegiate sports or athletic events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows wagering at casinos and racetracks on certain professional and collegiate sports or athletic events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateSubstituted by A4111 (2R)
2018-06-07SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Van Drew)
2018-06-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4111 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - Approved P.L.2018, c.33.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback