NJ S2585 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1991
Note: Carry Foward to future A2304
Note: Carry Foward to future A2304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Re-establishes Arthritis Quality of Life Initiative and Advisory Council on Arthritis in DHS.
Title
Re-establishes Arthritis Quality of Life Initiative and Advisory Council on Arthritis in DHS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2585 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2585 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A6002 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2585 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A6002 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee