NJ A2304 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A6002

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Re-establishes Arthritis Quality of Life Initiative and Advisory Council on Arthritis in DHS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Re-establishes Arthritis Quality of Life Initiative and Advisory Council on Arthritis in DHS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A6002 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1991 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback