NJ S2562 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCF and DHS to study predatory alienation and its effects on young adults and senior citizens.
Title
Requires DCF and DHS to study predatory alienation and its effects on young adults and senior citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4244 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.64. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A4244 |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4244 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2562