NJ A4244 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S3366
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCF and DHS to study predatory alienation and its effects on young adults and senior citizens.
Title
Requires DCF and DHS to study predatory alienation and its effects on young adults and senior citizens.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S2562 |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4244 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2562
S2562 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.64.
S2562 (Same As) 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.64.