NJ S2533 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.308.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.308.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Office of Victim-Witness Advocacy to provide services to certain inmates.
Title
Requires Office of Victim-Witness Advocacy to provide services to certain inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4091 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.308. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4091 (1R) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4091 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2533 (1R)