NJ S2527 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Agriculture to promote school meal programs.
Title
Requires Department of Agriculture to promote school meal programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4062 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.307. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4062 |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4062 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2527