NJ S2519 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.111.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public health emergency credits to be awarded to certain inmates and parolees during public health emergency; prohibits contact with victim upon release of inmate awarded credits.***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public health emergency credits to be awarded to certain inmates and parolees during public health emergency; prohibits contact with victim upon release of inmate awarded credits.***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.111.
2020-09-24SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-16)
2020-09-24SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (41-34-4)
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted for A4235 (4R)
2020-09-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
2020-09-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-08-27SenatePassed by the Senate (21-16)
2020-08-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-08-20SenateRecommitted to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2020-07-30SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Pou)
2020-07-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-11SenateTransferred to Senate Commerce Committee
2020-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4235 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2519 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback