NJ A4235 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2519 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public health emergency credits to be awarded to certain inmates and parolees during public health emergency; prohibits contact with victim upon release of inmate awarded credits.***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public health emergency credits to be awarded to certain inmates and parolees during public health emergency; prohibits contact with victim upon release of inmate awarded credits.***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted by S2519 (4R)
2020-09-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Budget Committee
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-08-24AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2020-07-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-20AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2020-06-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2519 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.111.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback