NJ S250 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4040
Note: Carry Over of previous A5711
Note: Carry Over of previous A5711
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.110.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Fair Chance in Housing Act"; establishes certain housing rights of persons with criminal records.
Title
"Fair Chance in Housing Act"; establishes certain housing rights of persons with criminal records.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1919 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1999 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1919 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1999 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.110. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-9) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-16-5) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A1919 (4R) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Reynolds-Jackson) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Singleton) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4040 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1919 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by S250 (3R)
A5711 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1919 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by S250 (3R)
A5711 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee