NJ A1919 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5711
Note: Carryover of previous S4040

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by S250 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Fair Chance in Housing Act"; establishes certain housing rights of persons with criminal records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Fair Chance in Housing Act"; establishes certain housing rights of persons with criminal records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03AssemblySubstituted by S250 (3R)
2021-05-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2021-05-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-05-05AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Housing Committee
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5711 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1919 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by S250 (3R)
S250 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.110.
S4040 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback