NJ S2492 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.106.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Enhances resident voting participation rights in common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances resident voting participation rights in common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4091 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.106.
2017-05-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-05-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2017-05-22AssemblySubstituted for A4091 (3R)
2017-03-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
2017-02-15AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2016-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-11-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2016-11-14SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2016-10-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4091 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S2492 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback