NJ A4091 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Substituted by S2492 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enhances resident voting participation rights in common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances resident voting participation rights in common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22AssemblySubstituted by S2492 (4R)
2017-03-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti)
2017-02-15AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2016-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2492 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.106.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback