NJ S2477 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by A1677 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by A1677 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes offense of unlawfully accessing location information of law enforcement vehicles through certain electronic means.
Title
Establishes offense of unlawfully accessing location information of law enforcement vehicles through certain electronic means.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | Substituted by A1677 (ACS) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1677 (Same As) 2013-08-09 - Approved P.L.2013, c.127.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2477 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2477_I1.HTM |