NJ S2465 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4791
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.138.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.138.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crimes of purchasing firearm parts to unlawfully manufacture firearms without a serial number, manufacturing or possessing covert or undetectable firearms, and manufacturing or facilitating the manufacture of firearms using a three-dimensional printer.**
Title
Establishes crimes of purchasing firearm parts to unlawfully manufacture firearms without a serial number, manufacturing or possessing covert or undetectable firearms, and manufacturing or facilitating the manufacture of firearms using a three-dimensional printer.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3129 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3129 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.138. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-5-3) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3129 (2R) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3129 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2465 (3R)
A4791 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4791 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee