NJ A3129 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4791
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2465 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2465 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crimes of purchasing firearm parts to unlawfully manufacture firearms without a serial number, manufacturing or possessing covert or undetectable firearms, and manufacturing or facilitating the manufacture of firearms using a three-dimensional printer.*
Title
Establishes crimes of purchasing firearm parts to unlawfully manufacture firearms without a serial number, manufacturing or possessing covert or undetectable firearms, and manufacturing or facilitating the manufacture of firearms using a three-dimensional printer.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2465 (3R) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4791 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2465 (Same As) 2018-11-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.138.
S2465 (Same As) 2018-11-08 - Approved P.L.2018, c.138.