NJ S2463 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Approved P.L.2023, c.60.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Approved P.L.2023, c.60.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide instruction on prevention of Lyme Disease and other tick-borne diseases in grades kindergarten through 12; requires DOH to publish certain guidelines concerning ticks.
Title
Requires school districts to provide instruction on prevention of Lyme Disease and other tick-borne diseases in grades kindergarten through 12; requires DOH to publish certain guidelines concerning ticks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4820 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4820 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.60. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-1) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A4820 (1R) |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |