NJ S2440 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2714
Note: Carry Foward to future S3030
Note: Carry Over of previous A5426
Note: Carry Over of previous S3572
Note: Carry Foward to future S3030
Note: Carry Over of previous A5426
Note: Carry Over of previous S3572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Bring Veterans to New Jersey Program."
Title
Establishes "Bring Veterans to New Jersey Program."
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2440 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2440 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A885 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5426 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3572 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2440 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A885 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5426 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3572 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2440 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2440_I1.HTM |