NJ S2418 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits retrofitting diesel-powered vehicles to increase particulate emissions for the purpose of "coal rolling"; prohibits the practice of "coal rolling".
Title
Prohibits retrofitting diesel-powered vehicles to increase particulate emissions for the purpose of "coal rolling"; prohibits the practice of "coal rolling".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3583 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3583 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3583 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.43. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-2-0) |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A3583 |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3583 (Same As) 2015-02-23 - Substituted by S2418