NJ S2417 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4397
Note: Carry Over of previous S2986
Note: Carry Over of previous S2986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic sports event as sports wagering; authorizes electronic sports wagering at certain locations.
Title
Includes electronic sports event as sports wagering; authorizes electronic sports wagering at certain locations.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2172 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A4397 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S2986 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4397 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S2986 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2417 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2417_I1.HTM |