NJ A4397 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2172
Note: Carry Foward to future S2417
Note: Carry Foward to future S2417
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic sports event as sports wagering; authorizes electronic sports wagering at certain locations.
Title
Includes electronic sports event as sports wagering; authorizes electronic sports wagering at certain locations.
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Don Guardian [R] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Rep. Claire Swift [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-09-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4397 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
A4397 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S2986 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4397 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S2986 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee