NJ S2381 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on January 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on January 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a long-term capacity agreement pilot program to promote construction of qualified electric generation facilities. *
Title
Establishes a long-term capacity agreement pilot program to promote construction of qualified electric generation facilities. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-28 | Approved P.L.2011, c.9. | |
2011-01-10 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-6) | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Assembly (57-15-5) | |
2011-01-10 | Emergency Resolution (Chivukula) (70-3-3) | |
2011-01-10 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chivukula) | |
2011-01-10 | Substituted for A3442 (2R) | |
2011-01-06 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chivukula) | |
2010-12-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-22 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee | |
2010-11-22 | Passed by the Senate (25-10) | |
2010-11-15 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-18 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3442 (Same As) 2011-01-10 - Substituted by S2381 (3R)