NJ S2374 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A3662 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A3662 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Rosa-Bonilla Family Act"; concerns development of carbon monoxide poisoning educational program for drivers.
Title
"Rosa-Bonilla Family Act"; concerns development of carbon monoxide poisoning educational program for drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted by A3662 (2R) |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3662 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.81.