NJ S2372 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Approved P.L.2015, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Attorney General to coordinate Statewide law enforcement efforts against opioid drug abuse.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Attorney General to coordinate Statewide law enforcement efforts against opioid drug abuse.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1436 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1436 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29AssemblyApproved P.L.2015, c.34.
2015-03-26AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2015-03-26AssemblySubstituted for A1436 (1R)
2015-03-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-02-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2015-02-05SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2014-10-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-09-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1436 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2372 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback