NJ S2371 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A3959 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A3959 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Hospitality Emergency Loan Program in EDA to provide no-interest loans to qualified small hospitality businesses; makes $100 million appropriation to EDA from federal funds for qualified small business assistance.
Title
Establishes NJ Hospitality Emergency Loan Program in EDA to provide no-interest loans to qualified small hospitality businesses; makes $100 million appropriation to EDA from federal funds for qualified small business assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Senate | Substituted by A3959 (3R) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment (38-0) (Gopal) |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3959 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly