NJ S2364 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program appointing third party vendors to administer commercial driver license testing.
Title
Establishes pilot program appointing third party vendors to administer commercial driver license testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3946 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.10. |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A3946 |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3946 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2364