NJ A3946 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program appointing third party vendors to administer commercial driver license testing.
Title
Establishes pilot program appointing third party vendors to administer commercial driver license testing.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Rep. David Rible [R] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted by S2364 |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2364 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.10.