NJ S2331 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Substituted by A2366 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - Substituted by A2366 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns contracting and licensing procedures for certain organizations under contract with DHS and DCF.
Title
Concerns contracting and licensing procedures for certain organizations under contract with DHS and DCF.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Substituted by A2366 (1R) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-07 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2366 (Same As) 2011-09-30 - Approved P.L.2011, c.136.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2331 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2331_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2331_R1.HTM |