NJ S2317 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1483
Note: Carry Over of previous A4303
Note: Carry Over of previous A4303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and updates law pertaining to guardianship to encourage ethical conduct by guardians and to provide stronger protections for wards and proposed wards.
Title
Revises and updates law pertaining to guardianship to encourage ethical conduct by guardians and to provide stronger protections for wards and proposed wards.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1483 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4303 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3996 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A4303 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3996 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2317 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2317_I1.HTM |