NJ S2314 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3723
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.
Title
Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted by A3723 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3723 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - Approved P.L.2018, c.17.