NJ A3723 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Approved P.L.2018, c.17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes and modifies clean energy and energy efficiency programs; modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2314 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.17.
2018-04-12SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-8)
2018-04-12SenateSubstituted for S2314
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (51-20-2)
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-03-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2314 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3723

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback