NJ S227 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3305
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.41.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.41.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT, NJTA, and SJTA to use only native vegetation for landscaping, land management, reforestation, or habitat restoration.
Title
Requires DOT, NJTA, and SJTA to use only native vegetation for landscaping, land management, reforestation, or habitat restoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A963 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.41. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A963 (1R) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-2) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A963 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S227 (1R)
A3305 (Carry Over) 2014-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A3305 (Carry Over) 2014-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee