NJ S2253 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1299
Note: Carry Foward to future S1895
Note: Carry Over of previous A1190
Note: Carry Foward to future S1895
Note: Carry Over of previous A1190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides corporation business tax credits and gross income tax credits for purchase of certain compressed natural gas vehicles.
Title
Provides corporation business tax credits and gross income tax credits for purchase of certain compressed natural gas vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2253 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2253 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A396 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1190 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2253 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A396 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1190 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee