NJ S2252 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A379
Note: Carry Over of previous A161
Note: Carry Over of previous S2653

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the "Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the "Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2252 (Carry Over) 2022-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A139 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A161 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S2653 (Carry Over) 2020-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback