NJ S2252 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes goals and initiatives for increased use of use of plug-in electric vehicles.**
Title
Establishes goals and initiatives for increased use of use of plug-in electric vehicles.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4819 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.362. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-9-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4819 (ACS) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-12) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3687 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4634 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4819 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2252 (SCS)
A4634 (Same As) 2018-10-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4819 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2252 (SCS)