NJ A4819 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2252 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes goals and incentives for increased use of plug-in electric vehicles in NJ.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes goals and incentives for increased use of plug-in electric vehicles in NJ.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S2252 (SCS)
2020-01-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-06AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2252 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.362.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback