NJ S2241 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.105.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.105.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of State to develop "New Jersey-Made" designation.
Title
Requires Department of State to develop "New Jersey-Made" designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3692 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.105. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3692 (1R) |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3692 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S2241 (1R)