NJ S2231 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows tax credits for development of qualified wind energy facilities in port district of Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.
Title
Allows tax credits for development of qualified wind energy facilities in port district of Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Senate (32-5) | |
2010-09-13 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-08-23 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3281 (Same As) 2010-09-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee