NJ S2226 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.253.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.253.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipality to authorize parking authority as redevelopment entity.
Title
Allows municipality to authorize parking authority as redevelopment entity.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2776 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2776 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.253. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-2) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-8-1) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A2776 (1R) |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-5) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2776 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S2226 (1R)